Senate | 05/21/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2571 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4055 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | RV#975 | Journal Page: 4055 |
House | 05/19/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4055 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4055 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 920 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 02/20/2009 | Filed |