House | 05/29/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2682 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/12/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 660 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 509 | |
House | 02/20/2009 | Filed |