E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 05/21/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4355 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4355 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4074 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2567 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 513 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 660 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 660 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 509 | |
House | 02/20/2009 | Filed |