Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR69 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.C.R. No. 69


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Douglas
 Keith Parsons of Pattonville, who passed away on January 9, 2009, at
 the age of 74; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Lamar County to J. D. and Irene Mahan Parsons
 on December 6, 1934, Douglas Parsons graduated from Chicota High
 School and attended Paris Junior College; he answered his nation's
 call to duty by enlisting in the U.S. Army in 1955 and spent several
 months stationed overseas; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Parsons married the former Peggy Sparks on
 January 24, 1958, after returning to the United States; the couple
 shared a half-century of marriage, during which time they were
 blessed with three children, and had the pleasure of welcoming
 eight grandchildren into their family; and
 WHEREAS, Employed by Uarco, Inc., for 15 years as a
 supervisor, this industrious Texan also worked as a farmer, ranch
 manager, breeder of prized Limousine cattle, and maker of custom
 hay bales during his lifetime; moreover, he served on the All Breed
 Bull Sale Committee; and
 WHEREAS, An active member of his community, Mr. Parsons was a
 member of the College Church of Christ, the Texas Retired Teachers
 Association, and the Lamar-Delta Retired Teachers and School
 Employees Association; he also gave of his time and energy to the
 McCuistion Regional Medical Center Auxiliary as a dedicated
 volunteer and to the Pattonville Community Center in his capacity
 as vice president; and
 WHEREAS, Although Douglas Parsons will be greatly missed, he
 led a caring and purposeful life, and his family and friends will
 long remember the many wonderful times they spent in his company;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Douglas Keith Parsons and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Peggy
 Sparks Parsons; to his children, Gregory Keith Parsons, Mark Alan
 Parsons and his wife, Tonya, and Kristi Boren and her husband,
 Randy; to his grandchildren, Drew Boren, Leah Boren and her fiance,
 Darren Lane, and Haley, Ty, Alisen, Davis, and Karyn Parsons; to his
 sisters, Elaine Roberts and her husband, Leon, and Marcy Campbell;
 and to his other loved ones; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Douglas Keith Parsons.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 69 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 12, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 69 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor