1 | 1 | | H.C.R. No. 69 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Douglas |
---|
6 | 6 | | Keith Parsons of Pattonville, who passed away on January 9, 2009, at |
---|
7 | 7 | | the age of 74; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, Born in Lamar County to J. D. and Irene Mahan Parsons |
---|
9 | 9 | | on December 6, 1934, Douglas Parsons graduated from Chicota High |
---|
10 | 10 | | School and attended Paris Junior College; he answered his nation's |
---|
11 | 11 | | call to duty by enlisting in the U.S. Army in 1955 and spent several |
---|
12 | 12 | | months stationed overseas; and |
---|
13 | 13 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Parsons married the former Peggy Sparks on |
---|
14 | 14 | | January 24, 1958, after returning to the United States; the couple |
---|
15 | 15 | | shared a half-century of marriage, during which time they were |
---|
16 | 16 | | blessed with three children, and had the pleasure of welcoming |
---|
17 | 17 | | eight grandchildren into their family; and |
---|
18 | 18 | | WHEREAS, Employed by Uarco, Inc., for 15 years as a |
---|
19 | 19 | | supervisor, this industrious Texan also worked as a farmer, ranch |
---|
20 | 20 | | manager, breeder of prized Limousine cattle, and maker of custom |
---|
21 | 21 | | hay bales during his lifetime; moreover, he served on the All Breed |
---|
22 | 22 | | Bull Sale Committee; and |
---|
23 | 23 | | WHEREAS, An active member of his community, Mr. Parsons was a |
---|
24 | 24 | | member of the College Church of Christ, the Texas Retired Teachers |
---|
25 | 25 | | Association, and the Lamar-Delta Retired Teachers and School |
---|
26 | 26 | | Employees Association; he also gave of his time and energy to the |
---|
27 | 27 | | McCuistion Regional Medical Center Auxiliary as a dedicated |
---|
28 | 28 | | volunteer and to the Pattonville Community Center in his capacity |
---|
29 | 29 | | as vice president; and |
---|
30 | 30 | | WHEREAS, Although Douglas Parsons will be greatly missed, he |
---|
31 | 31 | | led a caring and purposeful life, and his family and friends will |
---|
32 | 32 | | long remember the many wonderful times they spent in his company; |
---|
33 | 33 | | now, therefore, be it |
---|
34 | 34 | | RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
35 | 35 | | hereby pay tribute to the memory of Douglas Keith Parsons and extend |
---|
36 | 36 | | sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Peggy |
---|
37 | 37 | | Sparks Parsons; to his children, Gregory Keith Parsons, Mark Alan |
---|
38 | 38 | | Parsons and his wife, Tonya, and Kristi Boren and her husband, |
---|
39 | 39 | | Randy; to his grandchildren, Drew Boren, Leah Boren and her fiance, |
---|
40 | 40 | | Darren Lane, and Haley, Ty, Alisen, Davis, and Karyn Parsons; to his |
---|
41 | 41 | | sisters, Elaine Roberts and her husband, Leon, and Marcy Campbell; |
---|
42 | 42 | | and to his other loved ones; and, be it further |
---|
43 | 43 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
44 | 44 | | prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
45 | 45 | | Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of |
---|
46 | 46 | | Douglas Keith Parsons. |
---|
47 | 47 | | Homer |
---|
48 | 48 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
49 | 49 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
50 | 50 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 69 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
51 | 51 | | rising vote of the House on March 12, 2009. |
---|
52 | 52 | | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | 53 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
54 | 54 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 69 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
55 | 55 | | rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009. |
---|
56 | 56 | | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | 57 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
58 | 58 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
59 | 59 | | Date |
---|
60 | 60 | | __________________ |
---|
61 | 61 | | Governor |
---|