E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4137
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5197
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5123
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3185
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 3185
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3185
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3185
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2394
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to International Relations and Trade
|
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1168
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1034
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 510
|
House
|
02/27/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|