E | 04/03/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1093 | |
E | 03/31/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 742 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 988 | |
House | 03/27/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 933 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 619 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 771 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 771 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/12/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 665 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Filed |