E | 05/30/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6903 | |
E | 05/20/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4316 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2577 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4216 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4316 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3947 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2510 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 461 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 618 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 618 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Filed |