E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
05/25/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4569
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4310
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1275
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|