E | 05/20/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4316 | |
E | 05/13/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3680 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2317 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3436 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3680 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3173 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2209 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2209 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2209 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2209 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2049 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1659 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1659 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1029 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1216 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1216 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1014 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 684 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Filed |