Senate | 03/30/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 743 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 928 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 928 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 684 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |