E | 05/30/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6903 | |
E | 05/20/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4316 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2577 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4216 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4316 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3947 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2510 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 998 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1153 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1153 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1123 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1085 | |
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 685 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |