House | 05/11/2009 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 3157 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3081 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | RV#730 | Journal Page: 3081 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Failed of adoption | Journal Page: 3081 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3080 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Postponed | 5/11/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2976 |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2976 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2723 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | RV#651 | Journal Page: 2722 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Postponed | 5/7/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2647 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2647 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1872 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 804 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 804 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |