House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 851 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 851 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |