E
|
05/21/2009
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 4355
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4301
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4355
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 2044
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2044
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#440
|
Journal Page: 2241
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2241
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2241
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/1/09 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|