Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HJR122 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R4623 MTB-D
 By: Rodriguez H.J.R. No. 122


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment allowing the expenditure of
 motor vehicle fuel taxes and registration fees for passenger rail,
 transit, and freight rail.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-a. Subject to legislative appropriation, allocation
 and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment of all
 refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived from
 motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the
 sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way, constructing,
 maintaining, and policing such public roadways, and for the
 administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature
 pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads;
 and for the purpose of constructing, maintaining, and operating
 passenger rail, transit, and freight rail; [and for the payment of
 the principal and interest on county and road district bonds or
 warrants voted or issued prior to January 2, 1939, and declared
 eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment out of the County and
 Road District Highway Fund under existing law;] provided, however,
 that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from the motor fuel tax
 shall be allocated to the Available School Fund; and, provided,
 however, that the net revenue derived by counties from motor
 vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the maximum
 amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the percentage
 allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in effect on
 January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be construed as
 authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any purpose.
 SECTION 2. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment to allow the
 expenditure of motor vehicle fuel taxes and registration fees to
 construct, maintain, and operate passenger rail, transit, and
 freight rail."