E
|
06/03/2009
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6899
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6152
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4821
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6029
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6029
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4554
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4554
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5849
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5849
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5849
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5214
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2909
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2909
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2240
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#739
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/11/09 8:05 PM
|
Journal Page: 3143
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3143
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|