E
|
06/03/2009
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4521
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5828
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5828
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1508
|
Journal Page: 5828
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5828
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5203
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#331
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 282
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 282
|
House
|
01/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|