Senate | 05/22/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2440 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2440 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2368 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3417 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | RV#820 | Journal Page: 3417 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 3417 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Amended | 1-Eiland | Journal Page: 3417 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3417 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2673 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 511 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 511 | |
House | 01/12/2009 | Filed |