E | 05/26/2009 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 5164 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2913 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4569 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4353 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2730 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2570 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2444 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2095 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2095 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2011 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2554 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2419 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Record vote | RV#539 | Journal Page: 2419 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2419 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2419 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 512 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 512 | |
House | 01/14/2009 | Filed |