Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HJR60 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R1434 SLB-D
 By: Leibowitz H.J.R. No. 60


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the dedication of
 the revenue received from the sporting goods sales tax.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-c to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-c.  (a) For each state fiscal year, the revenue
 received from the collection of any state taxes imposed on the sale,
 storage, or use of sporting goods that were subject to taxation on
 January 1, 2009, under Section 151.801, Tax Code, is automatically
 appropriated when received to the Parks and Wildlife Department and
 to the Texas Historical Commission or their successors in function
 for the period necessary to accomplish the purposes set forth in
 Subsection (b) of this section and is allocated to those agencies as
 provided by general law.
 (b)  Money dedicated in Subsection (a) of this section may be
 used only to:
 (1)  manage and conserve the natural, cultural, and
 historical resources of this state; and
 (2)  provide hunting, fishing, and outdoor recreation
 opportunities for the people of this state.
 (c)  In this section, "sporting goods" means an item of
 tangible personal property designed and sold for use in a sport or
 sporting activity, excluding apparel and footwear except that which
 is suitable only for use in a sport or sporting activity, and
 excluding board games, electronic games and similar devices,
 aircraft and powered vehicles, and replacement parts and
 accessories for any excluded item.
 SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 81st Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2009, requiring the revenue received from the
 collection of the taxes imposed on the sale, storage, or use of
 sporting goods to be appropriated only to the Parks and Wildlife
 Department and the Texas Historical Commission.
 (b)  Section 7-c, Article VIII, of this constitution takes
 effect September 1, 2011, and applies only to state tax revenues
 that are collected on or after that date.
 (c) This temporary provision expires January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2009.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment requiring the revenue
 received from the collection of the taxes imposed on the sale,
 storage, or use of sporting goods to be appropriated only to the
 Parks and Wildlife Department and the Texas Historical Commission."