House | 05/11/2009 | Postponed | 6/2/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3150 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3150 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2135 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 02/27/2009 | Filed |