House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1263 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |