Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR1115

Introduced
3/27/09  
Refer
3/30/09  
Enrolled
4/2/09  

Caption

Recognizing March 31, 2009, as REALTOR Appreciation Day at the State Capitol.

Impact

The resolution serves to honor the contributions of more than 80,000 members of the Texas Association of REALTORS, who have actively promoted responsible governance and the principles crucial to the state's economic health. By formally designating a day to appreciate the efforts of real estate professionals, HR1115 aims to elevate the perception of the real estate profession within the legislative framework, acknowledging its integral role in the Texas economy and community development.

Summary

HR1115, also known as the resolution recognizing March 31, 2009, as REALTOR Appreciation Day, emphasizes the importance of private property rights in Texas, reflecting a long-standing commitment since the state's inception. It recognizes the Texas Association of REALTORS and its members, who have played a crucial role in assisting Texans with real estate transactions, thereby fostering a robust free enterprise system. The resolution praises REALTORS for their professional services and the integrity associated with the title, noting that their competencies have contributed to a stable real estate market in Texas.

Contention

Though this is a resolution rather than a bill imposing regulations or programs, it reflects ongoing contentions in the realm of property rights and real estate in Texas. The emphasis on private property rights aligns with broader debates regarding property regulations, land use, and market dynamics that can affect REALTORS and their clients. Recognizing a specific day for REALTORS could be seen as reinforcing their position within community dialogues about property rights, economic policies, and local governance.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HR1696

Recognizing April 14, 2015, as REALTOR Appreciation Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR982

Recognizing April 9, 2013, as REALTOR Appreciation Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR1131

Recognizing April 12, 2011, as REALTOR Appreciation Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR1044

Recognizing April 4, 2017, as REALTOR Appreciation Day at the State Capitol.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.