House | 04/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1722 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1722 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1147 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Filed |