H.R. No. 1253 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, Family and friends will long cherish their memories of Armando Salinas, who passed away on July 20, 2007, at the age of 94, and his wife, Francisca Salinas, who died on November 6, 2007, at the age of 93; and WHEREAS, The son of Petra and Toribio Salinas, Armando Salinas was born on March 23, 1913, in the Starr County town of Salineo; orphaned at the age of 13, he worked to support his four siblings; in 1939, he entered the produce business, first as an employee of Vahlsing Produce Company, and by the late 1940s as the owner and operator of a fleet of produce delivery trucks; he went on to retire as the proprietor of a tow truck business, which included a salvage yard and a used car lot in La Blanca; and WHEREAS, Mr. Salinas was known for his adventurous spirit and his willingness to try new things, and he was a lifelong Democrat who never failed to vote in an election; he relocated with his family to Elsa in 1942, and he helped his friends and neighbors in the community in every way he could, even using his own fleet of trucks to transport lumber for the construction of Sacred Heart Church; and WHEREAS, The former Francisca "Panchita" Canales was born to Natividad and Lucia Canales on April 2, 1914, in Salineo; married to Mr. Salinas for 69 years, she was a strong matriarch and an outstanding cook; she took great pride in keeping her kitchen busy and in entertaining relatives, friends, and neighbors, and she was cherished for her sense of humor, her wisdom, and her bright smile; and WHEREAS, Affectionately referred to as "Guelo" and "Guela," Mr. and Mrs. Salinas nurtured a devoted and close-knit family, instilling in their children the values of respect and humility and encouraging them to serve their communities; and WHEREAS, These caring citizens inspired others with their enduring commitment to one another through nearly seven decades as husband and wife, and they will forever be treasured in the hearts of all who were fortunate enough to know them; and WHEREAS, Representative Aaron Pea has justly recognized Armando and Francisca Salinas by authoring this resolution in their behalf during the Regular Session of the 81st Texas Legislature; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas Legislature hereby honor the lives of Armando and Francisca Salinas and extend sincere sympathy to the members of their family: to their sons, Cesar Salinas and his wife, Delia, Jorge Salinas and his wife, Esperanza, Armando Salinas, Jr., and his wife, Delia, Rene Salinas and his wife, Rosie, and Ernesto Salinas and his wife, Sandra; to their daughters, Amparo Bazan and her husband, Eduardo, and Frances Hinojosa; to their grandchildren and great-grandchildren; and to their other relatives and friends; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Armando and Francisca Salinas. Pea ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 1253 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on April 23, 2009. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House