1 | 1 | | H.R. No. 1253 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, Family and friends will long cherish their memories |
---|
6 | 6 | | of Armando Salinas, who passed away on July 20, 2007, at the age of |
---|
7 | 7 | | 94, and his wife, Francisca Salinas, who died on November 6, 2007, |
---|
8 | 8 | | at the age of 93; and |
---|
9 | 9 | | WHEREAS, The son of Petra and Toribio Salinas, Armando |
---|
10 | 10 | | Salinas was born on March 23, 1913, in the Starr County town of |
---|
11 | 11 | | Salineo; orphaned at the age of 13, he worked to support his four |
---|
12 | 12 | | siblings; in 1939, he entered the produce business, first as an |
---|
13 | 13 | | employee of Vahlsing Produce Company, and by the late 1940s as the |
---|
14 | 14 | | owner and operator of a fleet of produce delivery trucks; he went on |
---|
15 | 15 | | to retire as the proprietor of a tow truck business, which included |
---|
16 | 16 | | a salvage yard and a used car lot in La Blanca; and |
---|
17 | 17 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Salinas was known for his adventurous spirit and |
---|
18 | 18 | | his willingness to try new things, and he was a lifelong Democrat |
---|
19 | 19 | | who never failed to vote in an election; he relocated with his |
---|
20 | 20 | | family to Elsa in 1942, and he helped his friends and neighbors in |
---|
21 | 21 | | the community in every way he could, even using his own fleet of |
---|
22 | 22 | | trucks to transport lumber for the construction of Sacred Heart |
---|
23 | 23 | | Church; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | WHEREAS, The former Francisca "Panchita" Canales was born to |
---|
25 | 25 | | Natividad and Lucia Canales on April 2, 1914, in Salineo; married |
---|
26 | 26 | | to Mr. Salinas for 69 years, she was a strong matriarch and an |
---|
27 | 27 | | outstanding cook; she took great pride in keeping her kitchen busy |
---|
28 | 28 | | and in entertaining relatives, friends, and neighbors, and she was |
---|
29 | 29 | | cherished for her sense of humor, her wisdom, and her bright smile; |
---|
30 | 30 | | and |
---|
31 | 31 | | WHEREAS, Affectionately referred to as "Guelo" and "Guela," |
---|
32 | 32 | | Mr. and Mrs. Salinas nurtured a devoted and close-knit family, |
---|
33 | 33 | | instilling in their children the values of respect and humility and |
---|
34 | 34 | | encouraging them to serve their communities; and |
---|
35 | 35 | | WHEREAS, These caring citizens inspired others with their |
---|
36 | 36 | | enduring commitment to one another through nearly seven decades as |
---|
37 | 37 | | husband and wife, and they will forever be treasured in the hearts |
---|
38 | 38 | | of all who were fortunate enough to know them; and |
---|
39 | 39 | | WHEREAS, Representative Aaron Pea has justly recognized |
---|
40 | 40 | | Armando and Francisca Salinas by authoring this resolution in their |
---|
41 | 41 | | behalf during the Regular Session of the 81st Texas Legislature; |
---|
42 | 42 | | now, therefore, be it |
---|
43 | 43 | | RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas |
---|
44 | 44 | | Legislature hereby honor the lives of Armando and Francisca Salinas |
---|
45 | 45 | | and extend sincere sympathy to the members of their family: to their |
---|
46 | 46 | | sons, Cesar Salinas and his wife, Delia, Jorge Salinas and his wife, |
---|
47 | 47 | | Esperanza, Armando Salinas, Jr., and his wife, Delia, Rene Salinas |
---|
48 | 48 | | and his wife, Rosie, and Ernesto Salinas and his wife, Sandra; to |
---|
49 | 49 | | their daughters, Amparo Bazan and her husband, Eduardo, and Frances |
---|
50 | 50 | | Hinojosa; to their grandchildren and great-grandchildren; and to |
---|
51 | 51 | | their other relatives and friends; and, be it further |
---|
52 | 52 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
53 | 53 | | prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
54 | 54 | | Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Armando and |
---|
55 | 55 | | Francisca Salinas. |
---|
56 | 56 | | Pea |
---|
57 | 57 | | ______________________________ |
---|
58 | 58 | | Speaker of the House |
---|
59 | 59 | | I certify that H.R. No. 1253 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
60 | 60 | | rising vote of the House on April 23, 2009. |
---|
61 | 61 | | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | 62 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|