House | 05/02/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2012 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2012 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1727 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1200 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Filed |