House | 05/11/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 448 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 338 | |
House | 01/15/2009 | Filed |