Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR1299 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1299


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The passing of Danny Ray Robertson of Midland on
 December 12, 2008, at the age of 59, has deeply saddened the family
 and friends of this esteemed Texan; and
 WHEREAS, The son of T. Ray and Sylvia Martin Robertson, Dan
 Robertson was born on April 17, 1949, in Perryton, and he was raised
 in Spearman; after graduating from Spearman High School in 1967, he
 attended West Texas A&M University and later The University of
 Texas at Austin; Mr. Robertson married the former Donna Freeland on
 July 31, 1971, while they were both completing their studies at UT,
 and in 1976, he graduated with honors, earning a bachelor's degree
 in government; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Robertson worked on various political
 campaigns, and he was on the staff of Congressman Bob Krueger before
 joining Atlantic Richfield Company, known as ARCO, in 1979; he went
 on to hold numerous executive positions within the company,
 including director of government affairs; during this time, he and
 his young family lived in both Houston and Dallas, but they
 eventually settled in Midland, where Mr. Robertson became president
 of 180 Petroleum; he was also an investor and a consultant within
 the oil and gas industry; and
 WHEREAS, Active in numerous organizations, Mr. Robertson
 served as director of the Texas Lyceum, and he was involved in the
 Permian Basin Petroleum Association, the Texas Alliance of Energy
 Producers, the Petroleum Club of Midland, and the Permian Basin
 Workforce Development Board; he was also a longtime participant on
 the legislative committee of the Texas Oil and Gas Association, and
 he was the editor of the Oil Report for the Midland
 Reporter-Telegram; in addition, Mr. Robertson was on the Midland
 Wildcat Committee and the board of the Midland Community Concerts
 Association, and he was a dedicated supporter of the Permian Basin
 Petroleum Museum and the Save the Girls collection at the American
 Airpower Heritage Museum; and
 WHEREAS, Committed to his profession and his community, Dan
 Robertson touched the lives of countless individuals, and he will
 be greatly missed by all those who were privileged to know him; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Danny Ray Robertson
 and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Donna Freeland Robertson; to his sons, Duncan Robertson and
 his wife, Stephanie, and Stephen Robertson and his wife, Leah; to
 his sister, Brenda Annen and her husband, Claude; to his aunt, Sybil
 Miller and her husband, Billy; to his sister-in-law, Peggy Betz and
 her husband, Dennis; to his nieces and nephews; and to his other
 relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Dan
 Robertson.
 Craddick
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1299 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 23, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House