Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR1325 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R21336 JNC-D
 By: Pickett H.R. No. 1325


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, September 8, 2009, marks the 160th anniversary of
 the establishment of Fort Bliss, and this occasion provides a
 fitting opportunity to pay tribute to Major Jefferson Van Horne,
 the founder and first commander of the post; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Bucks County, Pennsylvania, Major Van
 Horne was born to Dorothy Johns Marple Van Horne and General Isaac
 Van Horne, a veteran of the American Revolution; following the
 family tradition of military service, he graduated from the U.S.
 Military Academy at West Point in 1827, and upheld its motto of
 "Duty, Honor, Country" throughout his life; and
 WHEREAS, His early assignments included frontier duty at
 Jefferson Barracks in Missouri and a tour at Fort Smith, Arkansas;
 from 1846 to 1848, he served his country in the Mexican War, and his
 distinguished efforts earned him promotion to the rank of major;
 and
 WHEREAS, In May 1849, Major Van Horne was instructed to
 establish a military post in what is now the El Paso County area; he
 departed Camp Salado on June 1, commanding six companies of the
 Third Infantry and supporting civilians, a total of nearly 400 men;
 and
 WHEREAS, With 275 wagons, the expedition represented the
 longest wagon train to embark westward across Texas; after 100 days
 and a 643-mile overland march, Major Van Horne and his men arrived
 at their destination on September 8, 1849; and
 WHEREAS, He served at the post until 1851 and went on to hold
 positions in San Elizario, and Fort Filmore and Fort Stanton, New
 Mexico; while on leave in his hometown of Zanesville, Ohio, he met
 Mary Gilbert, and after exchanging romantic letters for two years,
 the couple were married on November 28, 1850; together they had one
 son, Lewis Cass Van Horne; and
 WHEREAS, Major Van Horne's final duty was at the Post of
 Albuquerque, where he passed away on September 28, 1857; in 1854,
 the El Paso post he founded was named after Lieutenant Colonel
 William Bliss, the private secretary, son-in-law, and chief of
 staff to President Zachary Taylor; and
 WHEREAS, The establishment of this important military
 facility was accomplished by virtue of Major Van Horne's
 leadership, hard work, and steadfast dedication to duty; these
 values reflected the spirit of a dynamic and burgeoning nation,
 pushing westward to establish new settlements and discover new
 opportunities for growth and prosperity; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby recognize September 8, 2009, as Major Jefferson
 Van Horne Remembrance Day in the State of Texas and commemorate the
 160th anniversary of the arrival of Major Van Horne and his
 expedition in El Paso; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for Major General Howard B. Bromberg, commander of Fort
 Bliss and the Army Air Defense Artillery Center and School as an
 expression of high regard by the Texas House of Representatives.