Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR1427 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1427


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The Rio Grande Valley has given legions of
 courageous men and women to the United States armed forces, and one
 of the most heroic was Pedro Cano, of Hidalgo County; and
 WHEREAS, Born to Nicholasa Gonzalez Cano and Secundino Cano
 on July 7, 1920, in Nuevo Leon in Mexico, Mr. Cano moved with his
 family to Texas when he was just two months old; with the exception
 of the time he spent in the U.S. Army, he lived the rest of his life
 on the Texas side of the Rio Grande, where he worked as an
 agricultural laborer and farmer; and
 WHEREAS, When he was called up by the army during World War
 II, Mr. Cano, a slight man with limited knowledge of English, had
 little wish to leave the Valley; he reported for duty nevertheless
 and subsequently deployed to the European theater; in the fall of
 1944 he was with the 4th Infantry Division when that force, after
 helping to liberate Paris, launched an attack on the Siegfried
 Line; and
 WHEREAS, In the course of that push against German defenses,
 Private Cano fought in the months-long battle of Hurtgen Forest,
 and it was during that struggle that he etched his name in the
 annals of military valor; he was advancing with his company near
 Schevenhutte, Germany, in December 1944 when the unit came under
 withering fire from German machine guns; with his comrades pinned
 down, Private Cano worked his way forward alone, through a hail of
 fire and over more than 100 yards of heavily mined terrain, until he
 was within 30 feet of the nearest German emplacement; firing one
 round with his hand-held rocket launcher, he destroyed the position
 and killed its two gunners and five supporting riflemen; he then
 moved on toward a second emplacement, which he attacked with his
 rifle and hand grenades, killing several more soldiers; and
 WHEREAS, With another American company nearby similarly
 immobilized, Private Cano crept to within 15 yards of a third
 emplacement, killed its two gunners with a rocket, and then
 destroyed yet another emplacement and killed its gunners, enabling
 that company to also advance; and
 WHEREAS, The next day, the Americans once more encountered
 heavy German resistance, and Private Cano again moved forward alone
 with his bazooka; crossing open, fire-swept ground, he succeeded in
 suppressing three more machine-gun positions and killing their
 gunners, bringing to nearly 30 the number of German soldiers he
 killed during that two-day period; and
 WHEREAS, Sometime later, while on patrol, Private Cano and
 his platoon were surprised by German soldiers, who inflicted heavy
 casualties; Private Cano lay motionless on the ground until the
 assailants closed in, then tossed a grenade into their midst,
 wounding or killing all of them; and
 WHEREAS, It was in this engagement, or shortly thereafter,
 that Pedro Cano sustained injuries that left him permanently
 disabled; in addition to a Purple Heart, he was awarded two Silver
 Stars and a Distinguished Service Cross, the nation's
 second-highest award for gallantry; of the more than 16,100,000
 individuals who served in the U.S. armed forces during World War II,
 only 5,059 were recognized with the DSC; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Cano's most illustrious medal arrived by mail at
 his home near Edinburg, and the unassuming veteran put it away in a
 closet; area citizens, however, learned of the award and were
 indignant at the military's seeming lack of respect; they secured
 the cooperation of the U.S. War Department in planning a public
 celebration, much to Mr. Cano's consternation, and April 26, 1946,
 was designated Pedro Cano Day; and
 WHEREAS, Edinburg schools and most businesses closed for the
 occasion and some 4,000 local residents turned out to witness a
 parade, followed by a ceremony at the courthouse square; there,
 General Jonathan M. Wainwright, commander of the 4th Army,
 presented the DSC to Mr. Cano in the presence of Rear Admiral Joseph
 James Clark of the U.S. Navy, General J. Trinidad Rodriguez and
 Colonel J. Tiburcio Garza Zamorra of the Mexican Army, Texas State
 Senator Rogers Kelley, Valley military heroes William G. Harrell,
 Luis N. Gonzalez, and Jose M. Lopez, U.S. and Mexican consular
 officials, Mr. Cano's wife and mother, and a throng of
 well-wishers; in his remarks, General Wainwright declared that he
 believed Pedro Cano actually deserved the highest recognition of
 all, the medal of honor; and
 WHEREAS, The day's festivities also included a barbecue
 funded by public subscription, a luncheon and reception for Mr.
 Cano and special guests, and a dinner and dance hosted by the
 Edinburg Civic Association; in addition, the state commander of the
 American Legion conferred on Mr. Cano a life membership in that
 organization; and
 WHEREAS, In May 1946, Mr. Cano realized a longtime aspiration
 when he received his American citizenship; though disabled, he also
 longed to take up farming again, and the state stepped in to provide
 him with 40 acres, a house, a truck, and farm equipment; and
 WHEREAS, Pedro Cano died on June 24, 1952, as a result of a
 traffic accident; survived by his wife, Herminia Garza Cano, his
 daughters, Dominga and Maria, and his son, Susano, the 31-year-old
 veteran was buried with military honors in Edinburg, where today a
 street and an elementary school both bear his name; and
 WHEREAS, The heroism exhibited by Pedro Cano is a testament
 to the extraordinary capacity of the human spirit for selfless
 action in the face of near-certain death, and his fellow citizens
 owe this quiet Texan a lasting debt of gratitude and remembrance;
 and
 WHEREAS, Representative Aaron Pea has justly recognized
 Pedro Cano by authoring this resolution in his behalf during the
 regular session of the 81st Texas Legislature; now, therefore, be
 it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby commemorate the courageous service of Pedro Cano
 and recognize April 26, 2009, as Pedro Cano Day in Edinburg; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for Mr. Cano's family as an expression of high regard by
 the Texas House of Representatives.
 Pea
 Gonzales
 Guillen
 Lucio III
 Rios Ybarra
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1427 was adopted by the House on April
 21, 2009, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House