House | 05/04/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2142 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2142 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1865 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Filed |