House | 05/26/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/25/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4756 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4756 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2346 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2127 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Filed |