House | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3181 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3181 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2344 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2128 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Filed |