Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR1754 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1754


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Mary Ellen Murphy Hall of Rockwall on August 27, 2008, at
 the age of 83; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Jahalon Murphy and Argo Murphy
 Henry, Mary Ellen Murphy was born in Kemp on January 15, 1925; she
 graduated with honors from Kaufman High School, and she married
 Ralph Hall on November 14, 1944, in Pensacola, Florida, where Mr.
 Hall was serving as a lieutenant in the United States Navy; and
 WHEREAS, The couple made their first home in Daytona Beach,
 but returned to Texas after World War II and raised their three sons
 in Rockwall; a devoted wife and mother, Mrs. Hall helped her
 children do their homework every day and provided loving support to
 her husband through the years as he served as a county judge, state
 senator, and 14-term U.S. congressman; and
 WHEREAS, After her youngest child entered grade school, Mrs.
 Hall began commuting to East Texas State University to earn her
 college diploma; although she sometimes studied until well after
 midnight and then rose early in the morning to care for her family,
 she managed to complete her bachelor's degree with honors in just
 3-1/2 years, with a double major in speech and drama; and
 WHEREAS, This elegant and refined Texan traveled the world
 with her husband and enjoyed annual vacations in Daytona Beach, but
 home remained her favorite place of all, and caring for her
 grandchildren was one of her greatest delights; active in her
 community, she was a trustee of the Rockwall Independent School
 District for five years, serving twice as vice president, and a
 valued member of First United Methodist Church, where she taught
 its Friendship Class for many years; in addition, she was a group
 leader for Bible Study Fellowship, an international group of
 Biblical scholars; her other associations included the Texas Ladies
 Senate Club in Austin and the Congressional Wives Club in
 Washington, D.C., and she was an honorary member of Delta Kappa
 Gamma, the international honorary society for women in education;
 and
 WHEREAS, Mary Ellen Hall is deeply missed, but the memory of
 her graciousness, her generosity, and her strength of character
 remains to comfort and inspire all those who were privileged to know
 her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Mary Ellen Hall and
 extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her
 husband, U.S. Representative Ralph Hall; to her sons, Hamp Hall and
 his wife, Jody, Brett Hall and his wife, Karen, and Blake Hall and
 his wife, Catherine; to her grandchildren, Jay, Sarah, and Amanda
 Hall, Crystal Tucker, and Steven Lule; to her aunt, Verna Randall;
 to her sister-in-law, Rosemary Hall Scott; to her brother-in-law,
 Hugh O. Hall and his wife, Doris; to her nephew, Dr. Victor Scott,
 his wife, Vicki, and their children, Haley and Alexander; to her
 cousin, Wilburn Pritchard; and to her other relatives and friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Mary Ellen
 Hall.
 Laubenberg
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1754 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 11, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House