House | 05/30/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/27/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5105 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5105 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/25/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4570 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 3941 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Filed |