Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR1828 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1828


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Jimmie Doyle of Lamesa, a courageous
 Texan who gave his life in defense of his country during World War
 II, was finally laid to rest in his home state on April 25, 2009,
 more than 64 years after he was killed in action; and
 WHEREAS, Sergeant Doyle was an aerial gunner with the 424th
 Squadron of the 307th Heavy Bombardment Group of the United States
 Army Air Forces and completed numerous combat missions in the
 Pacific theater; on September 1, 1944, the B-24 bomber on which he
 was a crewmember was hit by antiaircraft fire while on a bombing run
 over Koror in the Palau Islands; he and seven of his fellow aviators
 died when the plane crashed into the ocean; three others parachuted
 from the plane but perished in captivity after being captured by the
 Japanese; and
 WHEREAS, Though he died at age 25, Jimmie Doyle had
 experienced much in his life; he was born on October 29, 1918, in
 McKinney, the son of Tom and Mamie Doyle, and later moved to
 Sweetwater; at age 17, in the midst of the Great Depression, he
 joined the Civilian Conservation Corps and was sent to work in
 Lamesa; there, he met Myrle Dean Wells, and the two were wed on
 September 21, 1940; the couple welcomed the arrival of their son,
 Tommy, in December of 1942, with Mr. Doyle supporting the family by
 working as a stonemason in the area; in August of 1943, with his
 country at war, he joined the armed forces; the following spring, he
 received his orders to depart for combat duty in the Pacific; and
 WHEREAS, The wreckage of Sergeant Doyle's plane went
 unrecovered for decades; then, in the early 2000s, the remnants of
 the submerged aircraft were located through the efforts of the Bent
 Prop Project, a volunteer organization dedicated to returning the
 remains of American service members who were lost during the air
 battles over Palau; Bent Prop's discovery prompted the Joint
 POW/MIA Account Command to conduct underwater recovery operations,
 which ultimately resulted in the repatriation of Sergeant Doyle's
 body; and
 WHEREAS, Two descendants of the fallen airman have had a
 personal connection to the recovery; Tommy Doyle, Jimmie's son, had
 the opportunity to travel to Palau and participate in dive
 operations on the submerged aircraft; U.S. Marine Captain Casey
 Doyle, Tommy's son and Jimmie's grandson, officially escorted the
 remains as they were returned to Texas; and
 WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Jimmie Doyle was buried next to his
 wife, Myrle, at Lamesa Memorial Park with full military honors,
 including a flyover and a 21-gun salute; this was a fitting tribute
 to a valiant member of the U.S. armed forces who made the ultimate
 sacrifice for his country, and the citizens of Texas and the United
 States owe him an eternal debt of remembrance for his brave service
 in a time of war; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby honor the life of Staff Sergeant Jimmie Doyle
 and extend deepest condolences to the members of his family: to his
 son, Tommy Doyle, and his wife, Nancy; to his grandchildren, Casey
 and Brandi Doyle; to his sister, Pat Presfield; and to his other
 relatives; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Sergeant
 Jimmie Doyle.
 Craddick
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1828 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 14, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House