House | 05/19/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3306 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3306 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2862 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Filed |