Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR1924 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 1924


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The citizens of Kerrville lost a beloved neighbor
 and much admired civic leader with the passing of Josephine
 Schreiner Parker on April 13, 2009, at the age of 92; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Kerrville, "Dodo" Parker was born on
 November 16, 1916, to Scott and Josephine Schreiner; she attended
 Schreiner Institute, graduated from Tivy High School, and earned
 her bachelor's degree from The University of Texas at Austin, where
 she was active in the Curtain Club and Pi Beta Phi sorority; she
 later studied voice in San Antonio and Los Angeles; and
 WHEREAS, She married E. C. Parker, Jr., on January 29, 1942,
 and while her husband served overseas during World War II, Mrs.
 Parker lived in New York City, studying music and voice at Juilliard
 School of Music and singing on occasion with the USO; and
 WHEREAS, In 1947, the couple settled in Kerrville, and in
 addition to raising her children, Mrs. Parker became an
 enthusiastic volunteer, supporting the Cub Scouts, teaching Red
 Cross water safety courses, and chairing the Kerr County United
 Fund Drive; she also shared her time with the boards of the Auld
 Youth Center and Kerrville Cemetery Association, served as
 president of the PTA at Starkey Elementary School, Peterson Middle
 School, and Tivy High School, and became the first woman to be
 elected to the Kerrville Independent School District Board; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Parker maintained a lifelong interest in the
 performing arts; she produced elaborate water shows in the Cascades
 Swimming Pool and hosted a radio talk show, interviewing such
 celebrities as Audie Murphy and Gene Autry; moreover, she held
 leadership positions with the Kerrville Community Concerts
 Association, Hill Country Arts Foundation, Kerrville Community
 Theater, and the Texas Arts Alliance, and she enjoyed playing roles
 in several productions at the Point Summer Theater; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted UT alumnus, Mrs. Parker served on the
 board of the institution's Arts and Sciences Foundation and as
 district councilwoman of the Texas Ex-Students' Association, board
 member of the UT Chancellor's Council, and member of the American
 Association of University Women; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Parker was also an advocate for Texas ranchers;
 appointed to the Governing Board of the National Wool Growers
 Association Auxiliary, she served as president of the Texas Sheep
 and Goat Raisers Association Auxiliary and as a member of the Kerr
 County Chapter Auxiliary board of the Texas Sheep and Goat Raisers
 Association; and
 WHEREAS, This esteemed Texan's most passionate pursuit was
 working to preserve local history for future generations; a member
 of the James Kerr Chapter of the Daughters of the American
 Revolution and the Captain Charles Schreiner Chapter of the United
 Daughters of the Confederacy, she was also a charter member and
 president of the Hill Country Preservation Society; she devoted
 more than three decades to the establishment of the Hill Country
 Museum at the Captain Charles Schreiner Mansion, the home of her
 great-grandfather, and considered it her greatest achievement; and
 WHEREAS, A gracious and giving woman, Dodo Parker contributed
 to her community through a lifetime of purposeful endeavor, and she
 leaves behind a legacy of good works that will resonate for years to
 come; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Josephine Schreiner
 Parker and extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to
 her husband, E. C. Parker, Jr.; to her children, Scott and Barbara
 Parker, Tobin and Kim Parker, and Cee Parker and Carlos Ibarra; to
 her grandchildren, Scott, Lauren, John, Schreiner, and Tobin; and
 to her other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Josephine
 Schreiner Parker.
 Hilderbran
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1924 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 14, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House