Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR1957 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1957


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Carlos
 Garcia, Sr., of Hondo, who died on March 21, 2009, at the age of 82;
 and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Garcia was born on October 9, 1926; he answered
 his nation's call to arms as a young man and served a tour of duty in
 World War II; and
 WHEREAS, He married Magdalena Gonzales on December 4, 1943,
 and together he and his wife raised eight sons, Carlos, Robert,
 Arnulfo, Adolfo, Richard, Simon, Daniel, and the late Louis Roy
 Garcia; and
 WHEREAS, In 1953, Mr. Garcia led efforts in Hondo to
 desegregate the public school system so that his sons would be
 afforded the same opportunities that other students received; at
 that time, students of Mexican American descent were enrolled at a
 separate facility known as the West End School; and
 WHEREAS, In order to end this form of discrimination, Mr.
 Garcia helped to bring the American GI Forum to Hondo, and it was
 through the GI Forum that he and four of his friends filed a lawsuit
 against Hondo public schools for segregating its students; and
 WHEREAS, In early 1953, Mr. Garcia and his colleagues
 traveled to Austin to make their voices heard, and their efforts
 were rewarded that fall, when Hondo schools were ordered to
 integrate; and
 WHEREAS, Because he fought for fairness, Mr. Garcia's
 grandchildren have attended such notable schools as Sul Ross State
 University, The University of Texas at San Antonio, Oral Roberts
 University, Texas A&M University, Tarleton State University, Texas
 Tech University, and The University of Texas; and
 WHEREAS, Carlos Garcia was a loving father and husband who
 stood up for equal rights for all; his efforts made a difference,
 not only for his children, but also for all succeeding generations,
 and his life was an inspiring example of the good that one person
 can accomplish; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Carlos Garcia, Sr.,
 and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Magdalena; to his sons; and to his other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Carlos
 Garcia, Sr.
 King of Zavala
 Straus Gattis Menendez Straus Gattis Menendez
Straus Gattis Menendez
 Allen Geren Merritt Allen Geren Merritt
Allen Geren Merritt
 Alonzo Giddings Miklos Alonzo Giddings Miklos
Alonzo Giddings Miklos
 Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal
Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal
 Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath
Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath
 Anderson Guillen Moody Anderson Guillen Moody
Anderson Guillen Moody
 Aycock Gutierrez Morrison Aycock Gutierrez Morrison
Aycock Gutierrez Morrison
 Berman Hamilton Naishtat Berman Hamilton Naishtat
Berman Hamilton Naishtat
 Bohac Hancock Oliveira Bohac Hancock Oliveira
Bohac Hancock Oliveira
 Bolton Hardcastle Olivo Bolton Hardcastle Olivo
Bolton Hardcastle Olivo
 Bonnen Harless Orr Bonnen Harless Orr
Bonnen Harless Orr
 Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr. Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr.
Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr.
 Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto
Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto
 Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker
Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker
 Burnam Hernandez Patrick Burnam Hernandez Patrick
Burnam Hernandez Patrick
 Button Herrero Paxton Button Herrero Paxton
Button Herrero Paxton
 Callegari Hilderbran Pea Callegari Hilderbran Pea
Callegari Hilderbran Pea
 Castro Hochberg Phillips Castro Hochberg Phillips
Castro Hochberg Phillips
 Chavez Hodge Pickett Chavez Hodge Pickett
Chavez Hodge Pickett
 Chisum Homer Pierson Chisum Homer Pierson
Chisum Homer Pierson
 Christian Hopson Pitts Christian Hopson Pitts
Christian Hopson Pitts
 Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla
Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla
 Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond
Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond
 Cook Hughes Riddle Cook Hughes Riddle
Cook Hughes Riddle
 Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra
Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra
 Crabb Isett Ritter Crabb Isett Ritter
Crabb Isett Ritter
 Craddick Jackson Rodriguez Craddick Jackson Rodriguez
Craddick Jackson Rodriguez
 Creighton Jones Rose Creighton Jones Rose
Creighton Jones Rose
 Crownover Keffer Sheffield Crownover Keffer Sheffield
Crownover Keffer Sheffield
 Darby Kent Shelton Darby Kent Shelton
Darby Kent Shelton
 Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant
Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant
 Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris
Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris
 Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee
Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee
 Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons
Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons
 Dukes Kolkhorst Strama Dukes Kolkhorst Strama
Dukes Kolkhorst Strama
 Dunnam Kuempel Swinford Dunnam Kuempel Swinford
Dunnam Kuempel Swinford
 Dutton Laubenberg Taylor Dutton Laubenberg Taylor
Dutton Laubenberg Taylor
 Edwards Legler Thibaut Edwards Legler Thibaut
Edwards Legler Thibaut
 Eiland Leibowitz Thompson Eiland Leibowitz Thompson
Eiland Leibowitz Thompson
 Eissler Lewis Truitt Eissler Lewis Truitt
Eissler Lewis Truitt
 Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant
Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant
 England Madden Turner of Harris England Madden Turner of Harris
England Madden Turner of Harris
 Farabee Maldonado Vaught Farabee Maldonado Vaught
Farabee Maldonado Vaught
 Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey
Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey
 Farrar Marquez Villarreal Farrar Marquez Villarreal
Farrar Marquez Villarreal
 Fletcher Martinez Vo Fletcher Martinez Vo
Fletcher Martinez Vo
 Flores Martinez Fischer Walle Flores Martinez Fischer Walle
Flores Martinez Fischer Walle
 Flynn McCall Weber Flynn McCall Weber
Flynn McCall Weber
 Frost McClendon Woolley Frost McClendon Woolley
Frost McClendon Woolley
 Gallego McReynolds Zerwas Gallego McReynolds Zerwas
Gallego McReynolds Zerwas
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1957 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 11, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House



Straus Gattis Menendez

Allen Geren Merritt

Alonzo Giddings Miklos

Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal

Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath

Anderson Guillen Moody

Aycock Gutierrez Morrison

Berman Hamilton Naishtat

Bohac Hancock Oliveira

Bolton Hardcastle Olivo

Bonnen Harless Orr

Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr.

Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto

Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker

Burnam Hernandez Patrick

Button Herrero Paxton

Callegari Hilderbran Pea

Castro Hochberg Phillips

Chavez Hodge Pickett

Chisum Homer Pierson

Christian Hopson Pitts

Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla

Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond

Cook Hughes Riddle

Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra

Crabb Isett Ritter

Craddick Jackson Rodriguez

Creighton Jones Rose

Crownover Keffer Sheffield

Darby Kent Shelton

Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant

Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris

Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee

Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons

Dukes Kolkhorst Strama

Dunnam Kuempel Swinford

Dutton Laubenberg Taylor

Edwards Legler Thibaut

Eiland Leibowitz Thompson

Eissler Lewis Truitt

Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant

England Madden Turner of Harris

Farabee Maldonado Vaught

Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey

Farrar Marquez Villarreal

Fletcher Martinez Vo

Flores Martinez Fischer Walle

Flynn McCall Weber

Frost McClendon Woolley

Gallego McReynolds Zerwas