Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR2035 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 2035


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The life of an admired business owner, community
 leader, and wife and mother drew to a close with the untimely death
 of Laurie Bushong Lang of Boerne on September 24, 2008, at the age
 of 50; and
 WHEREAS, Born on September 20, 1958, to Perry and Joan
 Bushong in Kerrville, the former Laurie Bushong grew up on Cedar
 Springs Ranch in Mountain Home; she graduated from Rocksprings High
 School and earned a bachelor's degree in physical education from
 Texas A&M University; and
 WHEREAS, On July 12, 1980, she exchanged vows with Michael
 David Lang; the couple enjoyed a rewarding marriage of more than 28
 years and were blessed with two children, Jeff and Sarah; and
 WHEREAS, The family settled in San Antonio in 1982, where
 Mrs. Lang worked for attorney Steve Kosub; in 1991, she was hired to
 manage the Kendall County Abstract Company, which she and her
 husband later purchased; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Lang was very active in her faith and a
 dedicated member of Messiah Lutheran Church in Boerne; in addition,
 she was a member and former president of the Sunrise Rotary Club of
 Boerne and served on the board of trustees for the Boerne
 Independent School District in 2004 and 2005; and
 WHEREAS, Always one to find great joy in the happiness of
 others, Laurie Lang never forgot a birthday, an anniversary, or any
 special occasion in the lives of her friends, family, and
 employees; although she is deeply missed, memories of the many
 happy times spent in her company remain to comfort all those who
 held her dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Laurie Bushong Lang
 and extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her
 husband, Michael David Lang; to her children, Jeffrey Michael Lang
 and Sarah Lang Goodman; to her parents, Perry and Joan Bushong; to
 her sister, Jane Brown; and to her other relatives and many friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Laurie
 Lang.
 Hilderbran
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2035 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 19, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House