1 | 1 | | H.R. No. 2305 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, The family and friends of U.S. Army Staff Sergeant |
---|
6 | 6 | | Wesley Hunter suffered an immeasurable loss with the death of this |
---|
7 | 7 | | valiant soldier on September 18, 2008, at the age of 28; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, Born on October 3, 1979, in Plainview to Bill and |
---|
9 | 9 | | Kathy Hunter, Wesley Hunter enlisted in the army after graduating |
---|
10 | 10 | | from Lockney High School in 1998; he served three years with the |
---|
11 | 11 | | 1/509 Infantry (Airborne) and later joined the Colorado National |
---|
12 | 12 | | Guard; returning to active duty in 2004, he was assigned to the 1/71 |
---|
13 | 13 | | Cavalry, 10th Mountain Division, in Fort Drum, New York; and |
---|
14 | 14 | | WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Hunter deployed to Iraq in August |
---|
15 | 15 | | 2005, and on February 26, 2006, his vehicle was struck by an |
---|
16 | 16 | | explosive device; although seriously wounded himself and under |
---|
17 | 17 | | continued fire, he bravely attempted to rescue two fellow soldiers |
---|
18 | 18 | | and was later awarded two Purple Hearts and a Bronze Star for his |
---|
19 | 19 | | heroism; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | WHEREAS, A gifted artist, Staff Sergeant Hunter attended the |
---|
21 | 21 | | Art Institute of Colorado in Denver; moreover, he was an Eagle Scout |
---|
22 | 22 | | and an outdoors enthusiast, and he belonged to the Church of Christ; |
---|
23 | 23 | | he married the former Rayanne Weese on July 26, 2004, in Colorado, |
---|
24 | 24 | | and the couple were blessed with two children, Westlin and Tavie; |
---|
25 | 25 | | and |
---|
26 | 26 | | WHEREAS, Americans owe a profound debt to our nation's |
---|
27 | 27 | | servicemen and servicewomen, whose love for their country inspires |
---|
28 | 28 | | them to take up military service; exemplifying the highest ideals |
---|
29 | 29 | | of the U.S. armed forces, Wesley Hunter inspired others with his |
---|
30 | 30 | | fortitude, tenacity, and courage; although his death has left a |
---|
31 | 31 | | void in the lives of his loved ones, they will forever carry their |
---|
32 | 32 | | memories of him close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it |
---|
33 | 33 | | RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas |
---|
34 | 34 | | Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Staff Sergeant Wesley |
---|
35 | 35 | | Hunter and extend deepest sympathy to the members of his family: to |
---|
36 | 36 | | his wife, Rayanne Hunter; to his children, Westlin and Tavie |
---|
37 | 37 | | Hunter; to his parents, Bill and Kathy Hunter; to his siblings, |
---|
38 | 38 | | Mandy and Jeff Hunter; to his niece, Anna Hernandez; and to his |
---|
39 | 39 | | other relatives and many friends; and, be it further |
---|
40 | 40 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
41 | 41 | | prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
42 | 42 | | Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Wesley |
---|
43 | 43 | | Hunter. |
---|
44 | 44 | | Heflin |
---|
45 | 45 | | ______________________________ |
---|
46 | 46 | | Speaker of the House |
---|
47 | 47 | | I certify that H.R. No. 2305 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
48 | 48 | | rising vote of the House on May 21, 2009. |
---|
49 | 49 | | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | 50 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|