Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR2342 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 2342


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Words cannot adequately express the heartache felt
 at the loss of United States Army Sergeant Samuel E. Kelsey of
 Troup, who died in Iraq on December 13, 2007, at the age of 24; and
 WHEREAS, A combat engineer, Sergeant Kelsey was assigned to
 the 3rd Battalion, 7th Infantry Regiment, 4th Brigade Combat Team,
 3rd Infantry Division, and based at Fort Stewart, Georgia; he was
 mortally wounded in Tunnis as he was trying to rescue another member
 of his unit who had been felled by an explosion; and
 WHEREAS, Sam Kelsey was born on June 28, 1983, and attended
 elementary and junior high school in Winona before moving to Troup,
 where he graduated from high school in 2001; his youth was filled
 with such activities as Little League and fishing and was spent
 among a wide circle of friends whom he considered family; and
 WHEREAS, This courageous Texan joined the army in March 2003;
 he was stationed for a time at Fort Leonard Wood and saw duty in
 Korea before being posted to Fort Stewart in March 2007; the
 following October, he was deployed on his second tour in Iraq; and
 WHEREAS, From the time he was a boy, Sam Kelsey won the hearts
 of all who knew him; his sunny, irrepressible nature as well as his
 gift for friendship and his genuine concern for others have left his
 loved ones with a rich legacy of cherished memories; as a soldier,
 his pride in serving his country and his determination to protect
 those under his command have also left a lasting impression; on
 December 23, 2007, at the instigation of his commanding officer,
 Patrol Base Kelsey was named in his honor; and
 WHEREAS, Charged with a difficult mission, Sergeant Kelsey
 responded with unfaltering courage, and his service and sacrifice
 are deserving of honor by every American; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Sergeant Samuel E.
 Kelsey and extend sincere sympathy to his mother, Denina Kelsey,
 and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the members of his family and that when the Texas House
 of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Sergeant
 Samuel E. Kelsey.
 Hopson
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2342 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House