1 | 1 | | H.R. No. 2457 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, The family and friends of U.S. Army Sergeant Bacilio |
---|
6 | 6 | | E. Cuellar of Odessa suffered a great loss with his untimely passing |
---|
7 | 7 | | on May 30, 2007, at the age of 24, while on duty in Iraq; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, When "Bozzy" Cuellar was born on June 23, 1982, in |
---|
9 | 9 | | Odessa, he weighed 10 pounds, 5 ounces, and measured 23 inches in |
---|
10 | 10 | | length; the first thing his dad asked the doctor was, "Is he going |
---|
11 | 11 | | to walk out of here with me?"; the strapping young fellow was named |
---|
12 | 12 | | after his paternal great-grandfathers; and |
---|
13 | 13 | | WHEREAS, It was apparent to his family very early on that this |
---|
14 | 14 | | was an unusually intelligent child; at the age of four years old, he |
---|
15 | 15 | | surprised many people by carrying on normal conversations with |
---|
16 | 16 | | adults; and |
---|
17 | 17 | | WHEREAS, Soft-spoken yet outgoing, Bozzy Cuellar never met a |
---|
18 | 18 | | stranger, and everyone in school knew him; he was a cooperative team |
---|
19 | 19 | | player and a respectful and considerate young man by nature who |
---|
20 | 20 | | always thought about the needs and comfort of others; he was also a |
---|
21 | 21 | | very loving person, one who was always there for family and friends; |
---|
22 | 22 | | and |
---|
23 | 23 | | WHEREAS, The teen was tough, however, when he needed to be; he |
---|
24 | 24 | | was not afraid to stand up to bullies and would bravely defend |
---|
25 | 25 | | others, a trait his future fellow soldiers would quickly discover; |
---|
26 | 26 | | and |
---|
27 | 27 | | WHEREAS, Friends and teachers from high school, though, |
---|
28 | 28 | | remember him especially as a talented musician; he loved to play the |
---|
29 | 29 | | drums and delighted listeners with his proficiency as a member of |
---|
30 | 30 | | the Permian High School drum line and in the years that followed; |
---|
31 | 31 | | and |
---|
32 | 32 | | WHEREAS, Bozzy Cuellar joined the army in July 2001 and |
---|
33 | 33 | | attended boot camp in Georgia; while there, he was able to lose more |
---|
34 | 34 | | than 50 pounds in just three short months; as with all young |
---|
35 | 35 | | soldiers, he had a love/hate relationship with basic training; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | WHEREAS, It was not long after completing boot camp that |
---|
37 | 37 | | Bozzy Cuellar met the love of his life, Nicki; the moment they met |
---|
38 | 38 | | on New Year's Eve 2002, it was love at first sight; and |
---|
39 | 39 | | WHEREAS, This courageous young Texan deployed several times |
---|
40 | 40 | | in service to his country; his first tours of duty abroad took him |
---|
41 | 41 | | to Kosovo, where he was stationed from May 2002 to November 2002, |
---|
42 | 42 | | and Bosnia, where he arrived in October 2003; in February 2004, he |
---|
43 | 43 | | deployed with his unit, the 1st Battalion, 18th Infantry Regiment, |
---|
44 | 44 | | in support of Operation Iraqi Freedom, and he served in Tikrit, |
---|
45 | 45 | | Iraq, until February 2005; and |
---|
46 | 46 | | WHEREAS, Sergeant Cuellar left for his fourth and final tour |
---|
47 | 47 | | on September 1, 2006, when he and the 1-18 Infantry shipped out |
---|
48 | 48 | | again, this time to fight in Baghdad; during that tour he enjoyed a |
---|
49 | 49 | | short period of leave with his family, and then he returned to Iraq |
---|
50 | 50 | | on April 2, 2007; Bozzy Cuellar died on May 30, 2007, in Baghdad, |
---|
51 | 51 | | and he was buried with full military honors at Fort Sam Houston |
---|
52 | 52 | | National Cemetery, in San Antonio, on June 15, 2007; and |
---|
53 | 53 | | WHEREAS, Bozzy and Nicki Cuellar were happy together until |
---|
54 | 54 | | his very last day; he was a wonderful husband and a devoted father |
---|
55 | 55 | | who had boundless love for his three sons; his wife has always said |
---|
56 | 56 | | that she could not have asked for a better husband and father for |
---|
57 | 57 | | their children; and |
---|
58 | 58 | | WHEREAS, The day that Bozzy Cuellar joined the army was a |
---|
59 | 59 | | proud moment for his family; he loved his job and performed his |
---|
60 | 60 | | difficult missions with exemplary dedication and professionalism; |
---|
61 | 61 | | between enlisting in the army, meeting Nicki, and receiving his |
---|
62 | 62 | | family's constant encouragement, Bozzy Cuellar accomplished a |
---|
63 | 63 | | 180-degree turn from an earlier period in his life when he sought |
---|
64 | 64 | | direction; by the time of his passing, he had grown to be a man who |
---|
65 | 65 | | continually worked to better himself and who inspired those around |
---|
66 | 66 | | him to do the same; Sergeant Cuellar was indeed an individual who |
---|
67 | 67 | | marched to the beat of his own drum; now, therefore, be it |
---|
68 | 68 | | RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas |
---|
69 | 69 | | Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of U.S. Army Sergeant |
---|
70 | 70 | | Bacilio E. "Bozzy" Cuellar and extend sincere condolences to the |
---|
71 | 71 | | members of his family: to his wife, Nicole Cuellar; to his sons, |
---|
72 | 72 | | Sebastian Cole Cuellar, Jeremy Shane Cuellar, and Cayden Xavion |
---|
73 | 73 | | Cuellar; to his mother, Lori Ann Cuellar; to his father, Rafael |
---|
74 | 74 | | Cuellar, Jr.; to his sister, Shauna Denee' Cuellar; and to his other |
---|
75 | 75 | | relatives and many friends; and, be it further |
---|
76 | 76 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
77 | 77 | | prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
78 | 78 | | Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of U.S. Army |
---|
79 | 79 | | Sergeant Bacilio E. Cuellar. |
---|
80 | 80 | | Lewis |
---|
81 | 81 | | ______________________________ |
---|
82 | 82 | | Speaker of the House |
---|
83 | 83 | | I certify that H.R. No. 2457 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
84 | 84 | | rising vote of the House on May 24, 2009. |
---|
85 | 85 | | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | 86 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|