Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR2508 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 2508


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Words cannot adequately convey the heartache felt at
 the loss of Staff Sergeant Jimy Mac Malone of Wills Point, who died
 on June 23, 2007, while bravely serving his country in Taji, Iraq;
 and
 WHEREAS, Sergeant Malone was born on July 27, 1983, in Irving
 to Martin and Vicky Malone; raised in Wills Point, he graduated from
 Wills Point High School in 2002 and attended the Kilgore Fire
 Academy before fulfilling his lifelong dream of enlisting in the
 U.S. Army on June 19, 2002; and
 WHEREAS, Training at Fort Knox, Sergeant Malone was stationed
 at Fort Hood before his deployment to Iraq as a member of 1st
 Cavalry Division, 1st Brigade Combat Team, 2nd Battalion, 8th
 Cavalry Regiment, Delta Company; he was serving his second tour of
 duty at the time he was killed, and his courageous efforts earned
 him the Bronze Star and Purple Heart; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted husband, Sergeant Malone was married to
 the former Leslie Diane Tisdale, and he was thrilled to be a new
 father to his daughter, Reagan Allison; he attended the First
 Baptist Church in Wills Point and was known for his exuberance and
 determination; and
 WHEREAS, Our state and nation are fortunate to have men and
 women whose love of country inspires them to take up military
 service; Sergeant Jimy Mac Malone embodied the highest ideals of
 the U.S. Armed Forces, and those who knew and loved him will forever
 carry him close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Staff Sergeant Jimy
 Mac Malone and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family:
 to his wife, Leslie Diane Tisdale Malone; to his daughter, Reagan
 Allison Malone; to his father, Martin Malone, and his wife, Ginger;
 to his mother, Vicky Lewis, and her husband, Trenten; to his
 brother, Marcus Malone; to his grandparents, Ramona Malone and
 Richard and Juanita Lee; to his half-brother, Kenneth Hogan; to his
 parents-in-law, Robert and Debbie Tisdale; to his brother-in-law,
 Hudnal Tisdale; and to his other relatives and many friends; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Staff
 Sergeant Jimy Mac Malone.
 Flynn
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2508 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 24, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House