Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR2650 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 2650


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Citizens of Avalon lost two beloved residents with
 the passing of James Kenneth Wilson on February 23, 2009, and his
 wife, Nannie Armstrong Wilson, on February 22, 2009; and
 WHEREAS, Married on July 10, 1941, this esteemed couple
 shared more than six decades together and were blessed with three
 sons, Jimmy, Joe, and Jerry, as well as seven grandchildren and six
 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Wilson, a native of Avalon, was born on January
 2, 1922, to Robert and Nora Wilson; he served his country as a
 member of the U.S. Army Air Corps during World War II and was a
 farmer and rancher; an active member of the Masonic Lodge of
 Chambers Creek and the Lions Club of Avalon, he also served his
 community as a member of the Avalon ISD Board of Trustees and the
 Ellis County Appraisal District; and
 WHEREAS, Born on July 6, 1923, in Byrd, Mrs. Wilson was the
 daughter of Samuel and Nancy Armstrong; she graduated from Ennis
 High School, where she was a member of the girls' state championship
 basketball team of 1941; she enjoyed spending time with her family
 and fellowship with her fellow members of the Order of the Eastern
 Star and the Baptist Women's Auxiliary; brought together in faith,
 she and her husband were dedicated members of the First Baptist
 Church; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Wilson set an outstanding example of
 citizenship and family devotion throughout their time on this
 earth, and though they will be deeply missed, they will always be
 remembered with love and admiration; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay special tribute to the lives of James
 Kenneth Wilson and Nannie Armstrong Wilson and extend sincere
 sympathy to the members of their family: to their sons, Jimmy
 Wilson, Joe Wilson and his wife, Norma, and Jerry Wilson and his
 wife, Charlotte; to their grandchildren, Jamie, Julie, Jeremy,
 Jason, Jerod, and Justin Wilson, and Jenny Wilson Page; to their six
 great-grandchildren; and to their other relatives and friends; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of James
 Kenneth Wilson and Nannie Armstrong Wilson.
 Pitts
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2650 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 31, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House