1 | 1 | | H.R. No. 2650 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, Citizens of Avalon lost two beloved residents with |
---|
6 | 6 | | the passing of James Kenneth Wilson on February 23, 2009, and his |
---|
7 | 7 | | wife, Nannie Armstrong Wilson, on February 22, 2009; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, Married on July 10, 1941, this esteemed couple |
---|
9 | 9 | | shared more than six decades together and were blessed with three |
---|
10 | 10 | | sons, Jimmy, Joe, and Jerry, as well as seven grandchildren and six |
---|
11 | 11 | | great-grandchildren; and |
---|
12 | 12 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Wilson, a native of Avalon, was born on January |
---|
13 | 13 | | 2, 1922, to Robert and Nora Wilson; he served his country as a |
---|
14 | 14 | | member of the U.S. Army Air Corps during World War II and was a |
---|
15 | 15 | | farmer and rancher; an active member of the Masonic Lodge of |
---|
16 | 16 | | Chambers Creek and the Lions Club of Avalon, he also served his |
---|
17 | 17 | | community as a member of the Avalon ISD Board of Trustees and the |
---|
18 | 18 | | Ellis County Appraisal District; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | WHEREAS, Born on July 6, 1923, in Byrd, Mrs. Wilson was the |
---|
20 | 20 | | daughter of Samuel and Nancy Armstrong; she graduated from Ennis |
---|
21 | 21 | | High School, where she was a member of the girls' state championship |
---|
22 | 22 | | basketball team of 1941; she enjoyed spending time with her family |
---|
23 | 23 | | and fellowship with her fellow members of the Order of the Eastern |
---|
24 | 24 | | Star and the Baptist Women's Auxiliary; brought together in faith, |
---|
25 | 25 | | she and her husband were dedicated members of the First Baptist |
---|
26 | 26 | | Church; and |
---|
27 | 27 | | WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Wilson set an outstanding example of |
---|
28 | 28 | | citizenship and family devotion throughout their time on this |
---|
29 | 29 | | earth, and though they will be deeply missed, they will always be |
---|
30 | 30 | | remembered with love and admiration; now, therefore, be it |
---|
31 | 31 | | RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas |
---|
32 | 32 | | Legislature hereby pay special tribute to the lives of James |
---|
33 | 33 | | Kenneth Wilson and Nannie Armstrong Wilson and extend sincere |
---|
34 | 34 | | sympathy to the members of their family: to their sons, Jimmy |
---|
35 | 35 | | Wilson, Joe Wilson and his wife, Norma, and Jerry Wilson and his |
---|
36 | 36 | | wife, Charlotte; to their grandchildren, Jamie, Julie, Jeremy, |
---|
37 | 37 | | Jason, Jerod, and Justin Wilson, and Jenny Wilson Page; to their six |
---|
38 | 38 | | great-grandchildren; and to their other relatives and friends; and, |
---|
39 | 39 | | be it further |
---|
40 | 40 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
41 | 41 | | prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
42 | 42 | | Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of James |
---|
43 | 43 | | Kenneth Wilson and Nannie Armstrong Wilson. |
---|
44 | 44 | | Pitts |
---|
45 | 45 | | ______________________________ |
---|
46 | 46 | | Speaker of the House |
---|
47 | 47 | | I certify that H.R. No. 2650 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
48 | 48 | | rising vote of the House on May 31, 2009. |
---|
49 | 49 | | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | 50 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|