House | 06/04/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 06/01/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 6913 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 6913 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 6910 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/31/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/29/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 5975 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Filed |