Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR296

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  

Caption

In memory of Selena Quintanilla Perez on March 31, 2009, the 14th anniversary of her death.

Impact

The resolution serves to commemorate Selena’s achievements and reinforce her significance within the Texas and broader Hispanic community. By officially recognizing her on the anniversary of her passing, HR296 seeks to instill pride in her enduring legacy as a pioneering artist who helped transform the Tejano music genre into a mainstream success. Moreover, it emphasizes the inspirational messages she communicated through her music, which encouraged empowerment and self-worth among young people, particularly women.

Summary

House Resolution 296 (HR296) recognizes the legacy of Selena Quintanilla Perez, a pivotal figure in Tejano music, on the 14th anniversary of her tragic death on March 31, 1995. The resolution honors her contributions to the music industry, her role as a cultural icon, and her impact on the Hispanic community. Selena, born in Texas, began her music career at a young age and quickly rose to prominence, earning numerous accolades including a Grammy Award for her work. The resolution highlights her influence not just as an artist but also as a role model for Hispanic youth, urging them to pursue education and healthy choices, while stepping away from negative influences.

Contention

While HR296 is largely celebratory, it also serves as a reminder of the cultural challenges faced by Latino artists in the mainstream music industry. Selena's story represents a commitment to the recognition and appreciation of Hispanic contributions to American culture, challenging historical narratives that often overlook such influences. Additionally, the resolution reflects broader socio-political conversations around identity, representation, and the importance of empowering future generations to embrace their cultural heritage.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX SR527

In memory of Josue V. Quintanilla.

TX HB1250

Relating to designating April 16 as Selena Quintanilla Pérez Day.

TX HB1456

Relating to designating April 16 as Selena Quintanilla Prez Day.

TX HB2492

Relating to designating April 16 as Selena Quintanilla Pérez Day.

TX HB3530

Relating to designating April 16 as Selena Quintanilla Prez Day.

TX HR62

Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on April 16, 2016, the 45th anniversary of her birth.

TX HR63

Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on April 16, 2015, the 44th anniversary of her birth.

TX HR93

Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Perez on April 16, 2013, the 42nd anniversary of her birth.